Solve 397 x 397 + 103 x 103 + 2 x 397 x 103

  1. 249996
  2. 25000
  3. 86436
  4. None of these
Monis Rasool Professor Asked on 21st May 2015 in Maths.
Add Comment
  • 1 Answer(s)

    Answer: (2) 25000
    397 x 397 + 103 x 103 + 2 x 397 x 103 = (397)2 + (103)2 + 2 x 397 x 103

    Formula:-   (a + b)2 = a2 + b2 + 2 x a x b

    (397)2 + (103)2 + 2 x 397 x 103 = (397 + 103)2

    = (500)2 = 500 x 500

    = 250000                 Ans.

    Anurag Mishra Professor Answered on 22nd May 2015.
    Add Comment
  • Your Answer

    By posting your answer, you agree to the privacy policy and terms of service.